THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Early Education (The British Association for Early Childhood Education), founded in 1923, is the leading national voluntary organisation for early years practitioners and parents with members throughout the UK. It provides support, advice and training on best practice for everyone concerned with childrens' education and care and promotes the right for all children to high quality education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £164,095 from 27 government contract(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 April 1963: Standard registration
- EARLY EDUCATION (Working name)
- BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Theobald | Chair | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Myra Mills McRobbie | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nazma Begum Meah | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sharpe | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaina Barbara Eakers | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola Demetriadi | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Sharkey | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hopkins | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Henderson | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Glenda Wyn Tinney | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Hudson | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Tuck | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £608.97k | £313.07k | £494.66k | £399.79k | £470.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £560.54k | £322.52k | £450.68k | £440.93k | £464.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £232.36k | £61.59k | £94.23k | £115.06k | £164.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | £232.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £307 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £608.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £302 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £145 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £560.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/05/1945 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/05/1947 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG CHILDREN, FAMILIES AND INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE CONCERNED WITH THE EDUCATION AND CARE OF YOUNG CHILDREN IN ALL WAYS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Regus
2 Victoria Square
Victoria Street
ST. ALBANS
AL1 3TF
- Phone:
- 01727 884925
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window