Financial history MARIA MONTESSORI TRAINING ORGANISATION

Charity Number: 313087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.96m £3.38m £3.58m £4.40m £3.98m
Total expenditure £2.87m £3.15m £3.42m £3.72m £4.09m
Income from government contracts £102.36k £164.01k £156.70k £132.87k £107.66k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.39k £8.01k £24.73k £576.43k £72.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.95m £3.38m £3.55m £3.80m £3.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.06k £199 £458 £15.06k £41.05k
Income - Other £2.66k £1.17k £819 £892 £6.27k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.87m £3.15m £3.42m £3.72m £4.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £33.91k £33.29k £36.82k £38.67k £46.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0