THE DUCHESS OF LEEDS FOUNDATION FOR BOYS AND GIRLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The net income of the foundation, after the payment of administrative expenses, is used to fund exhibitions and other benefits to Roman Catholic children attending Catholic schools and who, being resident in England, Wales or the Channel Islands, have lost both parents, or are fatherless or whose fathers do not provide them with effective financial support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP ARTHUR NICHOLAS NOEL | Chair | 24 March 1998 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Rothon | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|||||
MR HARRY SCROPE | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV GRAHAM PRESTON | Trustee | 13 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MARY WADDINGHAM | Trustee | 01 April 2009 |
|
|||||
JULIAN NICOLAS STOURTON | Trustee | 30 April 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.24k | £24.63k | £85.06k | £25.94k | £86.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.94k | £37.85k | £44.71k | £60.68k | £64.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24/10/1961.
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF EXHIBITIONS TO BOYS AND GIRLS WHO HAVE LOST BOTH PARENTS OR WHO ARE FATHERLESS TENABLE AT ANY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES AT WHICH RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IS GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND, WALES AND THE CHANNEL ISLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Kenton Road
Harrow
HA1 2BW
- Phone:
- 02084221950
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window