Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF EDUCATION COMMITTEES

Charity number: 313127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/10/2020 24/10/2021 24/10/2022 24/10/2023 24/10/2024
Total gross income £19.72k £89.16k £98.90k £280.94k £7.88k
Total expenditure £20.97k £78.38k £161.71k £318.40k £235.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A