JOEL SEAVERNS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small grants given to named young people preferably in connection with education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eric Lumsden | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR M B CLARK | Trustee | 12 March 1986 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN MALCOLM CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL MARY LUMSDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35k | £2.58k | £3.64k | £3.25k | £3.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £2.37k | £2.65k | £2.80k | £2.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 01/01/1924.
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION, CARE, MAITENANCE, SUPPORT OR BENEFIT OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE OF ANY CLASS OF SOCIETY WHETHER INFANTS OR ADULTS AND BEING EITHER POOR ORPHANS OR THE CHILDREN OF POOR PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 CLEVELAND ROAD
WORCESTER PARK
KT4 7JQ
- Phone:
- 02083300362
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window