THE MAURICE CECIL JOHNES LLOYD TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of funds to assist in education of young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Parkinson | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|||||
MAJOR JOHN ROBERT WHITFIELD MBE | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN DUNCAN TENNENT CLITHEROW | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER ROBERT NEWMAN | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.08k | £74.75k | £15.81k | £18.54k | £20.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.53k | £17.87k | £19.94k | £20.54k | £14.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26/02/1951.
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BETWEEN THE AGES OF FIVE AND TWENTY YEARS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Crawton
3A Kivernell Road
Milford on Sea
Lymington
Hampshire
SO41 0PT
- Phone:
- 07831758457
- Email:
- BOBCLITHEROW@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window