Accounts and annual returns ADVISORY CENTRE FOR EDUCATION (ACE) LTD

Charity number: 313142
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 29 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 31 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 31 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 27 September 2010 On Time