CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CES negotiates, on behalf of all bishops, with Government, and other national bodies on legal, administrative, and religious education matters in order to:promote Catholic interests in education; safeguard Catholic interests in education; contribute to Christian perspectives within educational debate at national levelworks closely with the Department for Catholic Education and Formation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 1965: Standard registration
- C E S (Working name)
- CATHOLIC EDUCATION COUNCIL (Previous name)
- CATHOLIC EDUCATION COUNCIL FOR ENGLAND AND WALES (Previous name)
- CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE FOR ENGLAND AND WALES (Previous name)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Right Reverend Marcus Stock | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 AUGUST 1965, AS AMENDED 21ST JANUARY 1994 AND 19TH FEBRUARY 1991.
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON IN ENGLAND OR WALES BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OR WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SEE 1994 DEED).
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE
39 ECCLESTON SQUARE
LONDON
SW1V 1BX
- Phone:
- 02079011900
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window