ALLIED SCHOOLS AGENCY LIMITED

Charity number: 313158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Not Required

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £183,875
Total expenditure: £184,082

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 2003: Standard registration
  • 04 August 2011: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew John Butterworth Trustee 31 July 2024
THE HOPE TRUST OXFORD
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EBBE WITH HOLY TRINITY AND ST PETER LE BAILEY, OXFORD
Received: On time
Claire Anne Tao Trustee 31 July 2024
None on record
Antony Robin Spencer Trustee 24 March 2023
None on record
Rev Nigel James Little Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Richard Mark Blair Wilkinson MA, PGCE Trustee 01 June 2019
F C CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev John Andrew Fisher Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
MARY KATHARINE HENDERSON MA, PGCE Trustee 30 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £173.09k £163.86k £181.84k £182.62k £183.88k
Total expenditure £172.64k £162.86k £181.80k £183.17k £184.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 15 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 09 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 26 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 08/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05/07/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING CANFORD SCHOOL BY THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, PRIZES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES AND LEAVING EXHIBITIONS ("THE AWARDS") (2) THE AWARDS MUST BE MADE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE GOVERNORS OF CANFORD SCHOOL AND ON THE RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEAD TEACHER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CANFORD SCHOOL IN DORSET
Registration history
  • 31 January 2003 : Standard registration
  • 04 August 2011 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
ELMHURST
HARCOURT HILL
OXFORD
OX2 9AS
Phone:
07989 494264
Website:

No information available