THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR GIFTED CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A national Information and Advice Service including Helpline, Assessment service, Fact Sheets and various regular publications for children with high learning potential and their parents. Training, workshops and events for children and young people; parents and carers and professionals. A network of branches and Explorer Clubs throughout England, Wales and N Ireland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 June 1967: Standard registration
- 14 November 2018: Funds received from 290181 THE MENSA FOUNDATION FOR GIFTED CHILDREN
- NAGC (Working name)
- POTENTIAL PLUS UK (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR GIFTED CHILDREN LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Rhys Christopher Jones | Chair | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Mary-Jane Maybury | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anil Joshi | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Fellows | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Branka Young | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Frederick Dipper | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Ramsden | Trustee | 21 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joy Morgan | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £291.08k | £156.89k | £241.14k | £688.46k | £219.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.71k | £271.58k | £288.21k | £313.67k | £434.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £469.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £169.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.61k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £47.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £313.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST MAY 1967. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 OCTOBER 1996, AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 OCTOBER 1998 as amended on 14 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL INTELLIGENCE AND/OR CREATIVE CAPACITY (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "GIFTED CHILDREN") AND TO ADVANCE, FURTHER AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION FOR GIFTED CHILDREN OF EDUCATION OF A NATURE SUITED TO AND LIKELY TO DEVELOP TO THEIR FULL POTENTIAL THEIR RESPECTIVE ABILITIES PROVIDE FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL INTELLIGENCE AND/OR CREATIVE CAPACITY, AND TO ADVANCE, FURTHER AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION FOR GIFTED CHILDREN OF EDUCATION OF A NATURE SUITED TO AND LIKELY TO DEVELOP TO THE FULL THEIR RESPECTIVE ABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Potential Plus UK
The Open University
Vaughan Harley Building Ground Floo
Walton Hall
Milton Keynes
MK7 6AA
- Phone:
- 01908646433
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window