Financial history SKIERS TRUST OF GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED

Charity number: 313185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.33k £4.56k £6.53k £20.53k £36.05k
Total expenditure £50.53k £28.92k £39.87k £32.59k £25.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A