SKIERS TRUST OF GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports snowsports by making grants primarily focused on young people and particularly in the context of education access for the disadvantaged, special educational needs, personal development and adventurous training, wellbeing and mental health as well as those developing their skills and talents as amateur sports competitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 May 1967: Standard registration
- Skiers Trust (Working name)
- BRITISH SKI EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- BRITISH SKI EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LIONEL BUDGE | Chair | 15 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edward Lowe | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Scott Mason | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Berry | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ingrid CHRISTOPHERSEN MBE | Trustee | 18 November 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.33k | £4.56k | £6.53k | £20.53k | £36.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.53k | £28.92k | £39.87k | £32.59k | £25.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 May 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/10/1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUST’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF SKIING INCLUDING BY, AMONGST OTHER METHODS: 1.1 IMPROVING ACCESS TO THE SPORT, FOR EXAMPLE BY PROVIDING INSTRUCTION, COACHING, EQUIPMENT AND TRANSPORT FOR SKIING AND ASSISTING WITH ASSOCIATED EXPENSES; AND 1.2 PROVIDING SUPPORT, BOTH FINANCIAL AND OTHERWISE, TO THOSE WHO ARE TALENTED AT SKIING AND WISH TO DEVELOP THEIR ABILITY IN SKIING; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING BY, AMONGST OTHER METHODS: 2.1 PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN SKI SAFETY AND SKI INSTRUCTING AND COACHING; AND 2.2 PROVIDING EDUCATION ABOUT THE GEOGRAPHY, GEOLOGY, METEOROLOGY, ECOLOGY, ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES AND OTHER PHYSICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF SKIING AREAS; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES INCLUDING BY, AMONGST OTHER METHODS: 3.1 PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION AND SUPPORTING PEOPLE IN BECOMING MORE PHYSICALLY ACTIVE TO IMPROVE THEIR HEALTH AND QUALITY OF LIFE; 3.2 PROVIDING INSTRUCTION, COACHING AND EQUIPMENT TO IMPROVE SKI SAFETY; AND 3.3 PROVIDING SUPPORT, BOTH FINANCIAL AND OTHERWISE, TO THOSE WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE SUFFERING FROM A SKIING RELATED INJURY OR ILLNESS; 4. THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN INCLUDING BY, AMONGST OTHER METHODS: 4.1 PROVIDING MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO EXPERIENCE SKIING; AND 4.2 PROVIDING INSTRUCTION, COACHING AND EQUIPMENT FOR SKIING TO MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES; 5. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT BY, AMONGST OTHER METHODS, PROVIDING SUPPORT, BOTH FINANCIAL AND OTHERWISE, TO PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES DESIGNED TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE SKIING ENVIRONMENTS; 6. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE INCLUDING BY, AMONGST OTHER METHODS: 6.1 PROVIDING SUPPORT, BOTH FINANCIAL AND OTHERWISE TO RESEARCH INTO THE GEOGRAPHY, GEOLOGY, METEOROLOGY, ECOLOGY, ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES AND OTHER PHYSICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF SKIING AREAS; AND 6.2 PROVIDING SUPPORT BOTH FINANCIAL AND OTHERWISE, TO RESEARCH INTO SKI SAFETY; AND 7. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE WHO HAVE PARTICIPATED IN, OR CONTRIBUTED TO, THE SPORT OF SKIING, INCLUDING BY, AMONGST OTHER METHODS, PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH ACCESS TO THE SPORT OF SKIING, AND SUPPORTING THEM, BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH PARK FARM
HIGH PARK
KIRKBYMOORSIDE
YORK
YO62 7HS
- Phone:
- 01234359170
- Email:
- trust@skierstrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window