ANGLO-DANISH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of knowledge of the arts, sciences and culture of the United Kingdom and Denmark; the award of grants for educational study in the United Kingdom and Denmark; and the support of any other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 December 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Harber | Chair | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Waterfield | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Chambers | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lone Mohr Curtis | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Scott | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Palle Baggesgaard Pedersen | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Schwarck | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bergstedt Jorgensen | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Davey | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.88k | £23.17k | £34.81k | £31.16k | £88.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.83k | £29.03k | £32.36k | £80.14k | £34.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES 1953 as amended on 10 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF DANISH STUDENTS IN GREAT BRITAIN BY PROVIDING SUITABLE FACILITIES AND ARRANGING MEETINGS.(B) TO SUPPORT, PROMOTE, RENDER ASSISTANCE AND MAKE DONATIONS TO SELECTED DANISH CHARITIES AND ESPECIALLY TO SECURE THE SUCCESS OF THE SCHEME CARRIED ON BY THE ANGLO-DANISH FUND LTD.(C) TO ENCOURAGE MEMBERS IN LITERARY, SCIENTIFIC AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL STUDIES AND ACTIVITIES BY PROVIDING LECTURES ON APPROPRIATE SUBJECTS AND ESPECIALLY ON THOSE TOUCHING UPON EDUCATIONAL INTERESTS OF DENMARK AND GREAT BRITAIN.(D) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR MEETINGS, OTHER THAN LECTURES, AT WHICH THE ABOVE AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES CAN BE PURSUED WITH A VIEW TO GREATER INTERCHANGE OF KNOWLEDGE AND LEARNING BETWEEN THE TWO COUNTRIES, AND THROUGH SUCH EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE FACILITIES TO PROMOTE BETTER UNDERSTANDING AND FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THE TWO COUNTRIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 MARESFIELD GARDENS
LONDON
NW3 5TF
- Phone:
- 02074357232
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window