THE HUME KENDALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust is to offer financial assistance for the education of the sons and daughters of Doctors or Dentists - including training for a professional or business career. The Trustees have agreed that in general the Trust should be used to assist in cases of great financial difficulty due to some family tragedy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 1969: Standard registration
- HUME KENDALL FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Peter John Rees | Chair |
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR DAVID WILLIAM BARTLETT | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr SAM LAKMAL THENABADU | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Rymer | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
PROF CHALLACOMBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR RICHARD ANTHONY CRANMER HUGHES MD FRCP | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JOHN GLEESON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SIR CYRIL CHANTLER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.77k | £4.93k | £4.86k | £5.15k | £5.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.25k | £9.25k | £0 | £771 | £1.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
CONTRIBUTIONS TOWARDS THE COST OF EDUCATING THE SONS OR DAUGHTERS (INCLUDING ADOPTED CHILDREN) OF ANY DOCTOR HOLDING A MEDICAL QUALIFICATION OR DENTIST, AT ANY SCHOOL, COLLEGE OR UNIVERSITY INCLUDING EDUCATION FOR A PROFESSIONAL OR BUSINESS CAREER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 WHYTELEAFE ROAD
CATERHAM
CR3 5EF
- Phone:
- 01883342289
- Email:
- KJEREMIAH36@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window