Accounts and annual returns THE CERTIFIED ACCOUNTANTS EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 313219
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 April 2022 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 April 2022 77 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window