Financial history THE CERTIFIED ACCOUNTANTS EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 313219
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £4.25m £2.72m £1.15m £1.12m £631.07k
Total expenditure £4.23m £3.52m £1.02m £910.83k £678.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.01k £0 £1.18k £2.74k £1.59k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.25m £2.71m £1.14m £937.41k £313.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.77k £2.98k £1.56k £178.00k £315.72k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.23m £3.52m £1.02m £910.83k £678.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.80k £25.09k £21.44k £23.00k £30.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £45.07k £25.17k £34.70k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0