ART WORKERS' GUILD TRUSTEES LTD

Charity number: 313228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity owns and manages the property and finances of the Art Workers' Guild.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £346,230
Total expenditure: £324,926

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Jeremy Smith Trustee 10 February 2024
None on record
Robert Michael Ryan Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
Joseph Wilfrid Whitlock Blundell Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
Jeremy Walton Nichols Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Frederick John Baier Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Hannah Mary Coulson Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Mark Winstanley Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record
Tracey Sheppard Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record
ALEC RICHARD MCQUIN Trustee 27 January 2016
YOUTH CANCER TRUST (UK) LIMITED
Received: On time
MR PHILIP ABEL Trustee 27 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £323.00k £257.82k £188.76k £258.39k £346.23k
Total expenditure £254.55k £204.46k £165.35k £223.50k £324.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 07 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 07 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 23 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 23 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 29 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 MAY 1903 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE THE RELIEF OF NEED (WHETHER BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE) AMONG ANY PAST OR PRESENT MEMBER OF THE GUILD OR ANY FAMILY MEMBER OR OTHER PERSON DEPENDENT UPON SUCH MEMBER OR MEMBERS (AND AS TO ANY PRESENT MEMBER WHETHER SUCH MEMBER SHALL OR SHALL NOT HAVE PAID HIS OR HER CURRENT SUBSCRIPTION TO THE GUILD)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 April 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
6 Queen Square
Bloomsbury
London
WC1N 3AT
Phone:
020 7713 0966