MINERS' WELFARE NATIONAL EDUCATIONAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSE OF THE FUND IS FOR THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO ASSIST MINEWORKERS AND THEIR DEPENDENT SONS AND DAUGHTERS TO TAKE ADVANTAGE OF OPPORTUNITIES TO EXTEND THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND LIFE EXPERIENCES THROUGH COURSES OF HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 February 1963: Standard registration
- 15 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MWNEF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.11k | £16.19k | £14.94k | £9.21k | £3.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.04k | £148.48k | £113.53k | £142.40k | £132.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STATUTORY INSTRUMENTS 1969, NO 928 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 1998 NO 3091 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/10/2015 AS AMENDED ON 04 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
A. MAKING GRANTS TO ENABLE OR ASSIST BENEFICIARIES TO TAKE EDUCATIONAL COURSES AT UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN GREAT BRITAIN OR ELSEWHERE AND TO PURSUE FURTHER STUDIES APPROVED BY THE SELECTION COMMITTEE OF THE FUND. B. DEFRAYING THE PROPER COSTS AND EXPENSES INCIDENTAL TO THE MAKING OF SUCH GRANTS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window