THE GEORGE DREXLER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was established in 1959 by the late George Drexler and exists for such charitable purposes connected with the advancement of education or with the relief of poverty for the families of such persons and amongst former employees of the Ofrex Group and their families and makes awards for these purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 1967: Standard registration
- THE GEORGE DREXLER-OFREX FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONTINE MEGAN DRESHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
Nicola Extance-Vaughan | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
LEELA KAPILA OBE FRCS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
MICHAEL ALAN EDGAR FRCS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
ALASTAIR COLLETT LLB | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.96k | £248.17k | £295.20k | £254.48k | £278.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.31k | £276.59k | £323.58k | £341.15k | £337.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 19TH JANUARY 1959 AS VARIED BY DEEDS DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1966, AND 13TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATIONINVLUFINH HIGHER COMMERCIAL EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS FORMERLY EMPLOYED ON COMMERCE OR OF THEIR HUSBANDS, WIVES, WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS ISSUE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS OF
ENGLAND
38-43 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 02078696086
- Email:
- info@georgedrexler.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window