THE GUILD FOR RESEARCH INTO CRAFTSMANSHIP LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 April 1964: Standard registration
- 11 February 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 11 February 2008: Funds transferred to 207480 THE GURDJIEFF SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.70k | £59.58k | £65.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.48k | £46.41k | £66.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 July 2007 | 26 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 21 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 01 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 27 June 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 27 October 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MARCH 1964 AS AMENDED 4 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND SUPPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE TRADITION AND CRAFTS OR SKILLS OF HORTICULTURE, HUSBANDRY, CABINET MAKING AND WOODWORKING OF ALL KINDS, WEAVING, DYEING, CARPET MAKING, NEEDLEWORK, POTTERY AND MODELLING, LEATHER WORK, BOOK BINDING, PUPPET MAKING AND SHOWING AND DRAWING PAINTING MODELLING AND DESIGN, IN CONNECTION WITH ALL SUCH CRAFTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window