Financial history THE HAROLD WILLIAM SANDERSON ART IN INDUSTRY FUND

Charity number: 313349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £17.09k £115.39k £11.37k £12.57k £18.22k
Total expenditure £14.18k £15.35k £35.06k £39.21k £28.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A