THE MAURICE LUBBOCK MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support and extend the educational activities in engineering science and management education provided by Oxford University and Balliol College
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAME Helen Frances GHOSH | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Christopher Paul Buckley | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|||||
MIKE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE HON LYULPH LUBBOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR JOHN LUCAS-TOOTH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1957
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, FELLOWSHIPS, APPRENTICE TRAINING, RESEARCH ETC. IN ENGINEERING AND RELATED SCIENCES INCLUDING MANAGEMENT AND COMMERCIAL ORGAINSATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BALLIOL COLLEGE
BROAD STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3BJ
- Phone:
- 01865277763
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window