THE MENDELSSOHN SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION (INCLUDING THE BOISE SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION)

Charity Number: 313360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees make an annual award of a cash sum for musical composition and for performance in alternate years. Music students of any nationality being of either sex, below the age of 30, resident in Great Britain or any part of Ireland, as well as British Commonwealth students temporarily resident in Great Britain or Ireland for their musical education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £17,969
Total expenditure: £32,484

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 1963: Standard registration
  • 06 December 2011: Funds received from 313361 THE BOISE FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE MENDELSSOHN SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR JONATHAN FREEMAN-ATTWOOD CBE Chair
RAM COLLECTIONS TRUST
Received: On time
COUNTESS OF MUNSTER MUSICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SAGA TRUST
Received: On time
GARSINGTON OPERA LIMITED
Received: On time
CONSERVATOIRES UK
Received: On time
James Williams Trustee 01 September 2024
THE MAYFIELD VALLEY ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
Lesley Page Trustee 05 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £16.39k £15.32k £149.70k £17.54k £17.97k
Total expenditure £17.54k £7.79k £152.53k £16.71k £32.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 23 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 January 2021 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HELP MUSICIANS UK
7-11 BRITANNIA STREET
LONDON
WC1X 9JS
Phone:
020 7239 9100
Website:

No information available