Accounts and annual returns THE HOWARD MUMMERY MEMORIAL PRIZE

Charity number: 313373
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 11 April 2007 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 14 July 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required