Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTION OF MINING AND METALLURGY

Charity number: 313383
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted