THE INSTITUTION OF MINING AND METALLURGY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1978: Standard registration
- 06 January 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 06 January 2009: Funds transferred to 269275 THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, MINERALS & MINING
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF INCORPORATION DATED 9 FEBRUARY 1915 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTARY CHARTER DATED 19TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF ECONOMIC AND ENGINEERING GEOLOGY, MINING AND ITS ASSOCIATED TECHNOLOGIES, MINERAL AND PETROLEUM ENGINEERING AND EXTRACTION METALLURGY AND ALL ENGINEERING RELATED THERETO. (FOR FULL DESCRIPTION SEE CLAUSE 2 OF 1998 CHARTER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 06 November 1978 : Standard registration
- 06 January 2009 : Removed
- 06 January 2009 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window