ASSOCIATION OF MBAS AND BUSINESS GRADUATES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF BUSINESS EDUCATION AT POST-GRADUATE LEVEL BY THE PROVISION PRIMARILY OF AN ACCREDITATION SERVICE FOR THE DELIVERY OF QUALITY MASTERS OF BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION PROGRAMMES AT UNIVERSITIES WORLDWIDE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£4,265,563
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.16m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £37.59k | |
Other | £1.07m |
Total expenditure:
£3,950,165
Raising funds | £544.22k | |
Charitable activities | £3.41m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £544.22k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.41m | |
Retained for future use | £315.40k |
People

30 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kazakhstan
- Lebanon
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Monaco
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Peru
- Poland
- Portugal
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Singapore
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uruguay
- Venezuela
Governance
- 15 May 1969: Standard registration
- THE ASSOCIATION OF MBAS (Working name)
- BUSINESS GRADUATES ASSOCIATION LTD (Previous name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF MASTERS IN BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Previous name)
- THE ASSOCIATION OF MASTERS IN BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Wendy Anne Loretto | Chair | 16 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Beatrice Elcira AVOLIO ALECCHI | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Bach | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Bhaskar Chakrabarti | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Morris MTHOMBENI | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Maria Spens | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Gabriel Georges Metais | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josep Franch Bullich | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fangruo Chen | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN LEENDERT VAN DE VELDE | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gary Narunsky | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34m | £2.91m | £3.19m | £3.70m | £4.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.39m | £2.90m | £2.76m | £3.18m | £3.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.55k | £1.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £806.72k | £255.05k | £464.75k | £836.32k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.53m | £2.66m | £2.72m | £2.86m | £3.16m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.80k | £3.17k | £260 | £2.24k | £37.59k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.73m | £2.85m | £2.73m | £2.81m | £3.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £330.60k | £53.76k | £32.10k | £377.96k | £544.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.13k | £12.37k | £9.85k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £330.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £122.13k | £72.50k | £39.88k | £105.11k | £162.12k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.99m | £3.16m | £3.89m | £4.26m | £4.86m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.60m | £1.70m | £1.99m | £1.92m | £2.30m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH NOVEMBER 1967 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 1989, 28 NOV 1991, 23 JANUARY 2001, 4 DECEMBER 2003 AND 29 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 FEB 2017 as amended on 29 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE BUSINESS EDUCATION AT A POST GRADUATE LEVEL. TO RECEIVE AND ADMINISTER FUNDS OR OTHER ASSETS FOR THE PROMOTION OF INDIVIDUAL OR COLLECTIVE RESEARCH WORK BY THE AWARD OF GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS OR PRIZES OR ON BEHALF OF ANY BODY ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THOSE OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8th Floor
3 Dorset Rise
London
EC4Y 8EN
- Phone:
- 02072462686
- Email:
- info@associationofmbas.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window