THE COMMUNICATION, ADVERTISING AND MARKETING EDUCATION FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes for the general benefit of the public the advancement of communication, advertising and marketing education at all levels. Provides educational facilities both general and specialised for persons taking part or intending to take part in the communication, advertising and marketing processes. Assists in the improvement of educational and training standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 August 1970: Standard registration
- THE CAM FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angus MacIver | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Golding | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giovanna Battiston | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Mackman | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Daly | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Gilder Bateson | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.15k | £19.55k | £19.51k | £18.34k | £21.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £775 | £1.97k | £750 | £3.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/04/1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/1979 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNICATION, ADVERTISING AND MARKETING EDUCATION AT ALL LEVELS AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES BOTH GENERAL AND SPECIALISED FOR PERSONS TAKING PART OR INTENDING TO TAKE PART IN THE COMMUNICATION, ADVERTISING AND MARKETING PROCESSES AND GENERALLY TO ASSIST IN THE IMPROVEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING STANDARDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF MARKETING
MOOR HALL
THE MOOR
COOKHAM
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 9QH
- Phone:
- 01628427410
- Email:
- cam@cim.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window