THE HAMPDEN (EDUCATIONAL) TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education with particular emphasis on projects to assist in countries that have witnessed conflict in recent years. Previous projects have assisted in the education of women in Afghanistan and school children in Kosovo.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 February 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
M/S BARBARA EMERSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES STANFORD GIMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TOM DALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARONESS FALKNER OF MARGRAVINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
M/S MARIE WOOLF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR EDUCATION IN HISTORY,GEOGRAPHY,ECONOMICS,INTERNATIONAL LAW AND RELATIONS INTERNATIONAL LAW AND RELATIONS INTERNATIONAL AFFAIRS AND RELATED SOCIAL SCIENCES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 COLERIDGE COURT
PARKLEYS
RICHMOND
TW10 5LN
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- barbaracemerson@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window