INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL ILLUSTRATORS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance education in all matters connected with medical illustration and any subjects ancillary to or of use or benefit in that profession.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 1971: Standard registration
- INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ILLUSTRATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Lamoon | Chair | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edwards | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Joseph Roddick | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Meredith | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Marie Jones | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Quinlan | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Jane McFall | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE TOVEY | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MARGARET FLEMING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY BERNARD GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.31k | £48.57k | £59.93k | £109.65k | £160.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.60k | £45.11k | £70.77k | £83.49k | £129.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JUNE 1968 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 JAN. 1971
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE THE ACQUISITION AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE VARIOUS ARTS AND SCIENCES CONNECTED WITH MECIAL AND BIOLOGICAL ILLUSTRATION. TO ACT AS AN EDUCATIONAL AND QUALIFYING BODY IN THE PROFESSION AND ORGANISE RESEARCH AND CNFERENCES ON THE SUBJECT OF MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ILLUSTRATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 COLDBATH SQUARE
LONDON
EC1R 5HL
- Phone:
- 0115 978 7291
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window