MIDLAND NEUROSCIENCE TEACHING AND RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
makes grants to appropriate medical personnel who undertake research work within the charity's objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 16 November 1971: Standard registration
- MNTRF (Previous name)
- THE MIDLAND CENTRE FOR NEUROSURGERY AND NEUROLOGY TEACHING AND RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
- THE MIDLAND NEUROSCIENCE TEACHING AND RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM ARTHUR FLINT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Georgios Tsermoulas | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Hayton | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Wakerley | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Hardy | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Antonio Belli | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.11k | £23.46k | £27.98k | £30.80k | £28.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.16k | £15.90k | £29.60k | £18.54k | £20.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1971 as amended on 02 Jan 1996
Charitable objects
THE TRUST FUND IS TO BE APPLIED TO, FOR AND UPON SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (IT IS INTENDED THAT THE FUND BE USED PRIMARILY FOR MEDICAL AND SURGICAL TEACHING AND RESEARCH).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suites 2&4
Lodge Park House
Kettering Venture Park
Kettering
- Phone:
- 01604 211073
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window