THE BEDFORD COLLEGE ASSOCIATION SPECIAL FUND TRUST (incorporating the Royal Holloway and Bedford New College Association Trust)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Granting of bursaries to former students of Bedford College, Royal Holloway College and Royal Holloway & Bedford New College.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 October 1970: Standard registration
- THE BEDFORD COLLEGE ASSOCIATION SPECIAL FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MICHAEL DELANEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr HANNES WILLIAM KLEINEKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ANDREW COSGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL MEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ENID AUDREY LIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON ELIZABETH CRAMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | £1.49k | £1.57k | £2.05k | £3.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.56k | £560 | £2.35k | £1.16k | £560 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 JUNE 1970 as amended on 08 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE CONNECTED WITH OR RELATING TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS OR DISTRESS OF THE PAST STUDENTS OF BEDFORD COLLEGE OR SUCH OTHER PERSONS APPROVED BY THE COMMITTEE AND THE TRUSTEE WHO CAN SHOW PAST OR PRESENT SERVICE TO BEDFORD COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Marsh Mills
Wargrave Road
Henley-on-Thames
RG9 3JD
- Phone:
- 01491579950
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window