THE HARRY STEELE BODGER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the aims and aspirations of the late Harry Steele-Bodger by awarding a travel scholarship to assist a visit by an individual to a veterinary or agricultural school or research institute, or some other course of study approved by the governing committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 January 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Steele-Bodger | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA JANE PAULL | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEONARD WILLIAMS MRCVS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW MARTIN BIGGS BVSC MRCVS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £808 | £639 | £606 | £606 | £606 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.50k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 26TH AUGUST, 1953
Charitable objects
TO AWARD TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP OR MAKE A GRANT FOR A TERM OF STUDY OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EIRE TO MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF VETERINARY SURGEONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION
7 MANSFIELD STREET
LONDON
W1G 9NQ
- Phone:
- 02076366541
- Email:
- bvahq@bva.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window