Financial history B'NAI B'RITH HILLEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £674.24k £666.83k £842.39k £1.81m
Total expenditure £766.77k £518.94k £660.65k £956.51k £1.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.64k £20.41k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.06m £649.98k £645.68k £821.83k £1.80m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £24.32k £24.25k £20.41k £20.56k £10.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £744 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £400.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £711.90k £461.39k £591.71k £905.09k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £54.87k £57.55k £68.94k £50.82k £74.29k
Expenditure - Governance £18.90k £9.00k £8.16k £20.03k £20.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £608 £608