Financial history ANGLO-ISRAEL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 313523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £133.92k £125.84k £72.10k £92.59k £110.11k
Total expenditure £164.38k £190.68k £164.22k £277.92k £97.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A