Financial history THE INNS OF COURT AND THE BAR EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 313524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £107.52k £54.13k £59.06k £54.85k £53.47k
Total expenditure £147.66k £96.92k £113.15k £98.83k £118.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A