Trustees LORD KITCHENER NATIONAL MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 313525

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE LADY EMMA KITCHENER LVO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon Christopher Piggott | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mary Provis | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Saunders | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher de mattos | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Skipworth | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS MACFARLANE | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LT GEN DAVID BILL KCB | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.