Financial history THE AIR PILOTS TRUST

Charity number: 313606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £173.83k £41.52k £149.40k £173.54k £157.55k
Total expenditure £165.85k £40.37k £142.54k £159.64k £165.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A