THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The College of Teachers aims to: - recognise, develop and assert the intellectual authority, leadership and professional excellence of teachers - provide an independent source of advice on educational issues backed by experience and research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,151,142
Donations and legacies | £192.83k | |
Charitable activities | £1.96m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,124,233
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.12m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.12m | |
Retained for future use | £26.91k |
People

30 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 1984: Standard registration
- THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING (Working name)
- COLLEGE OF PRECEPTORS (Previous name)
- COLLEGE OF TEACHERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Robert Wolfe | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Tania Mary Craig | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rebecca Hanson | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Dr Caroline Teresa Creaby | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Haili Hughes | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Katherine Howard | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Meena Kumari Wood | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Dr Katharine Jane Bridge | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Wedyan Dannan | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Jacqueline Anne Hill | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Alexandra Mary Stewart-Dean | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Dr Steven Berryman | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Liz Gregory | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
SUFIAN SADIQ | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Hannah Victoria Knowles | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Natasha Crellin | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Aimee Catherine Tinkler | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Paul Barber | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Marcus Richards | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64m | £2.01m | £1.98m | £2.20m | £2.15m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.27m | £2.04m | £2.11m | £2.15m | £2.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.03m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.61m | £872.45k | £276.87k | £213.29k | £192.83k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.03m | £1.14m | £1.70m | £1.99m | £1.96m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.26m | £2.04m | £2.11m | £2.15m | £2.12m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.28k | £0 | £23.52k | £0 | £28.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £62.94k | £54.50k | £45.26k | £35.19k | £30.47k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.53m | £1.46m | £1.19m | £1.32m | £1.24m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £841.03k | £787.98k | £644.92k | £709.40k | £592.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF INCORPORATION DATED 28 MARCH 1849 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18TH MARCH 1998. as amended by supplemental Charter 18 Jul 2017 null
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOUND LEARNING AND THE IMPROVEMENT AND RECOGNITION OF THE ART, SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF TEACHING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (WHERE TEACHING MAY INCLUDE BUT SHALL NOT BE LIMITED TO INSTRUCTION, RESEARCH, AND ASSESSMENT).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 15 April 1984 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coram Campus
41 Brunswick Square
London
WC1N 1AZ
- Phone:
- 02079115589
- Email:
- hello@chartered.college
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window