THE TRAMWAY MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns and maintains the Crich Tramway Village, home of the National Tramway Museum at Crich Derbyshire, which is devoted to tramways and allied interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,297,380
Donations and legacies | £451.96k | |
Charitable activities | £1.21m | |
Other trading activities | £599.33k | |
Investments | £40.96k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,240,579
Raising funds | £609.21k | |
Charitable activities | £1.63m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,411 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £609.21k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.63m | |
Retained for future use | £56.80k |
People

45 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 1963: Standard registration
- CRICH TRAMWAY VILLAGE (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL TRAMWAY MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Pendleton | Chair | 30 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Cooper Brown | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Whiteley | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Graeme Paul Wigglesworth | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Sturgess | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Milton | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MARTIN BENHAM | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian David Pleace | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|||||
David Webb | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Frodsham | Trustee | 30 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09m | £1.49m | £1.88m | £1.88m | £2.30m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.54m | £1.64m | £2.03m | £2.11m | £2.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.00k | £228.75k | N/A | £3.41k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £980.67k | £945.62k | £446.30k | £490.17k | £451.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £596.45k | £169.11k | £469.36k | £464.58k | £599.33k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.23m | £368.73k | £963.86k | £917.58k | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.99k | £2.24k | £0 | £4.12k | £40.96k | |
|
Income - Other | £274.64k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £692.00k | £169.29k | £16.45k | £432.57k | £373.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £1.28m | £1.58m | £1.62m | £1.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £576.99k | £359.46k | £445.79k | £489.74k | £609.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.69k | £19.25k | £18.00k | £0 | £20.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.69m | £3.42m | £3.20m | £3.03m | £3.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.99m | £2.96m | £3.16m | £3.10m | £2.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£188.00k | -£334.00k | -£178.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £251.69k | £108.00k | £219.90k | £216.85k | £262.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17/12/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27/4/1968, 21/5/1977, 13/5/1978, 2/5/1981, 22/5/1982, 17/5/1986, 28/3/1987, 19/5/1990, 15/5/1999, 10/6/2000, 15/6/02, 7/6/03 AND 26 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JUL 2016 as amended on 26 Sep 2020 as amended on 12 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
4 The Society’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: For the public benefit to advance education and to promote the preservation of tramways, light railways, and other historical vehicles, buildings and equipment, and items of general transport interest of scientific importance or educational value, in particular but not exclusively by: (a) Maintaining an operating tramway museum; (b) Arranging exhibitions to demonstrate the working of tramway and light railway carriages and other historical vehicles; and (c) Promoting study and research into the historical, scientific, and social aspects of tramways, light railways and other historical vehicles by maintaining a library and archive of books, photographs, films, videos and electronic data.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
National Tramway Museum
Matlock Road
Crich
MATLOCK
DE4 5DP
- Phone:
- 01773 854 321
- Email:
- enquiry@tramway.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window