POLLOCK'S TOY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise exhibitions and public events in libraries and other public places to promote the interest in old toys and toy theatre for educational and research purposes. Publish printed and online material relating to the Charity's objectives. Work with Pollock's Toy Museum on conservation and cataloguing of the collections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 December 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALAN A R POWERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Panagiota Kotoula | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Maude Cross | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lettice Kemp | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Peasgood | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Clare Hewlett Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEBBY BROWN | Trustee | 28 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD COULSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69k | £761 | £1.63k | £1.39k | £15.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £60 | £158 | £5.04k | £11.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH NOVEMBER 1968 AND SCHEME DATED 10 JULY 1987
Charitable objects
1. TO ACQUIRE BY WAY OF PURCHASE GIFT OR LOAN A COLLECTION OF TOYS AND GAMES OF ALL AGES AND FROM ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD. 2. TO DISPLAY THE SAID COLLECTION IN A MUSEUM WHICH SHALL BE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, TO BE KNOWN AS "POLLOCK'S TOY MUSEUM", IN SUCH A WAY AS TO BE OF EDUCATIONAL AND HISTORICAL VALUE TO CHILDREN, STUDENTS, RESEARCH WORKERS AND SCHOLARS. 3. TO PROMOTE LECTURES AND PUBLICATIONS ON THE SUBJECT OF TOYS AND GAMES AND ALLIED SUBJECTS; 4. TO ESTABLISH A LIBRARY OF BOOKS, RECORDS, TAPE RECORDINGS AND FILMS ON THE SUBJECTS A FORESAID OR ANY OF THEM. 5. TO ACQUIRE BY WAY OF PURCHASE OR LEASE PREMISES SUITABLE FOR THE HOUSING OF THE SAID COLLECTION AND THE OTHER PURPOSES AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 JUDD STREET
LONDON
WC1H 9NE
- Phone:
- 02073873154
- Email:
- pasquito@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window