Financial history THE SCHOOLS MUSIC ASSOCIATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 313646
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £34.05k £34.78k £18.86k £30.92k £13.18k
Total expenditure £31.84k £25.05k £32.20k £20.90k £36.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A