ROBERT ADDY HOPKINSON EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Robert Addy Hopkinson Educational Trust provides small hardship grants to individuals through Ruskin College or other further education institutes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 January 1968: Standard registration
- 03 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 September 2019: Funds transferred to 309701 RUSKIN COLLEGE
- ROBERT ADDY HOPKINSON EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91k | £3.68k | £3.88k | £3.80k | £2.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £4.91k | £3.93k | £663 | £672 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 01 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 28 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 12 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE CHANCERY DIVISION SCHEME OF 13TH JUNE 1951. AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
TO GRANT SCHOLARSHIPS TO SELECTED STUDENTS TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND COURSES OR DO RESEARCH WORK AT COLLEGES OR UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS. TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF DISCUSSION GROUPS FORMED IN LONDON OR ANY OTHER SUITABLE CENTRES OF POPULATION IN GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND FOR ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AMONGST ADULTS OF HISTORY, ECONOMICS, POLITICAL SCIENCE, PHILOSOPHY, LANGUAGE, MUSIC, LITERATURE, ART, THE NATURAL AND PHYSICAL SCIENCES OR ANY OTHER SUBJECTS WHATSOEVER OF A REASONABLY GENERAL EDUCATIONAL CHARACTER.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window