UNITED KINGDOM LITERACY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The sole object of UKLA is the advancement of education in literacy. To this end UKLA's activities include informing and supporting its members; commissioning and publishing books and other resources; organising conferences; supporting and disseminating research; liaising with external bodies and presenting an informed national voice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 May 1967: Standard registration
- 04 October 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1190848 UNITED KINGDOM LITERACY ASSOCIATION
- UKLA (Working name)
- UNITED KINGDOM READING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.48k | £276.39k | £231.38k | £238.26k | £236.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.65k | £218.89k | £231.12k | £260.42k | £260.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 13 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 13 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BY-LAWS (UNDATED) AS AMENDED ON 24 MAY 2003, AS AMENDED 9TH JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN LITERACY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window