SOCIETY FOR ECONOMIC ANALYSIS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is the promotion of both the production and dissemination of high quality research in the general area of Economics, with particular emphasis on the support of young researchers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
Governance
- 10 April 1972: Standard registration
- S E A L (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Andrea Galeotti | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Kalina Manova | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Davide Werner Cantoni | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor RUBEN ENIKLOPOV | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor FLORIAN SCHEUER | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Swati Dhingra | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Professor MARIA PETROVA | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.70k | £313.36k | £250.39k | £149.59k | £187.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.24k | £7.43k | £23.99k | £146.74k | £106.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 29TH DECEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY FOSTERING, PROMOTING AND FURTHERING INTEREST IN AND KNOWLEDGE OF ECONOMICS AND OTHER SOCIAL SCIENCES AND FOR SUCH PURPOSE TO ARRANGE LECTURES, SEMINARS, CONFERENCES, CLASSES AND OTHER DISCUSSIONS. B. TO PROMOTE FACILITIES FOR AND TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPLEMENT THE FACILITIES FOR RESEARCH IN ECONOMICS AND OTHER SOCIAL SCIENCES, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE PROVISION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Broomfield Avenue
LONDON
N13 4JR
- Phone:
- +442078494632
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window