THE INTERNATIONAL SCIENCE POLICY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 313721
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 September 1966: Standard registration
- 22 July 2003: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THE INTERNATIONAL SCIENCE POLICY FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE SCIENCE OF SCIENCE FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE SCIENCE POLICY FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH JULY 1966 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 20/11/1967, 14/2/1969, 14/10/1970 AND 16/9/1986.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN RELATION TO:- (I) THE AIMS, METHODS AND ACHIEVEMENTS OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, AND (II) THE EFFECTS OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND THEIR PURSUIT ON HUMAN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.