OSTEOPATHIC TRUSTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research into, and promotion of osteopathy. Providing osteopathic care to the public, independent of their ability to pay, and education for medical doctors in osteopathic principles and practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 1962: Standard registration
- 01 August 2018: Funds received from 1022554 THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF MUSCULOSKELETAL MEDICINE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE JANE SURRIDGE | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Belshaw | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Mary Neaves | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Tanner | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Allcock | Trustee | 04 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.18k | £115.05k | £145.71k | £142.78k | £118.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.18k | £136.63k | £176.73k | £138.89k | £93.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
04 March 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 12 DECEMBER 1935
Charitable objects
TRAINING AND EDUCATING STUDENTS IN ALL BRANCHES OF SCIENCE AND LEARNING NECESSARY OR USEFUL FOR OSTEOPATHIC, MEDICAL AND SURGICAL PRACTICE OR PROFESSION. THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION FOR NURSES, MASSEURS AND PERSONS ENGAGED IN ASSISTING IN NURSING AND TREATING THE SICK, INJURED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 BOSTON PLACE
LONDON
NW1 6QH
- Phone:
- 02072625250
- Email:
- admin@lcom.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window