THE POETRY BOOK SOCIETY LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Poetry Book Society is a charity which operates a book club (The PBS) and runs and awards the T S Eliot Prize. Its mission is to propagate the art of poetry and to increase the reading of poetry through the active engagement of readers and audiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £5,600 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 1962: Standard registration
- 31 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.33k | £275.94k | £229.68k | £219.40k | £242.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289.32k | £283.08k | £229.96k | £227.58k | £263.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 04 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 21 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 22 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH DECEMBER 1953 AS AMENDED 26TH MAY 1983
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF THIS COUNTRY BY FOSTERING AND PROPOGATING THE ART OF POETRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window