VSO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VSO IS THE WORLD'S LEADING INDEPENDENT INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCY WORKING FOR CHANGE THROUGH VOLUNTEERS. VSO BRINGS PEOPLE TOGETHER TO SHARE SKILLS, CREATIVITY AND LEARNING TO BUILD A FAIRER WORLD. VSO HAS PROGRAMMES IN OVER TWENTY DEVELOPING COUNTRIES FOCUSING ON DELIVERING SUSTAINABLE CHANGE IN THREE THEMATIC AREAS: EDUCATION, HEALTH AND SECURE LIVELIHOODS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£32,059,000
Donations and legacies | £22.54m | |
Charitable activities | £9.00m | |
Other trading activities | £226.00k | |
Investments | £290.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£34,522,000
Raising funds | £5.13m | |
Charitable activities | £29.39m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £9,079,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.13m | |
Charitable expenditure | £29.39m |
People

473 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 11 |
£70k to £80k | 12 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- VSO (Working name)
- VOLUNTARY SERVICE OVERSEAS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mashaer Bashir-Ali | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Mohau Motholo | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belay Addise Cheffik | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monalisa Sibongile Zwambila | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maryam Abisola Adefarati | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marie Muir | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Skingsley | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lalla-Maharajh | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Laura Hickey | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MUWANGUZI | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.19m | £49.43m | £33.31m | £40.40m | £32.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.95m | £46.95m | £38.81m | £39.18m | £34.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.81m | £5.99m | £67.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.60m | £18.56m | £15.66m | £12.97m | £9.08m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £25.81m | £32.01m | £24.08m | £30.97m | £22.54m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.95m | £265.00k | £276.00k | £295.00k | £226.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £31.37m | £17.15m | £8.93m | £9.00m | £9.00m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £118.00k | £9.00k | £30.00k | £136.00k | £290.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £941.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £836.00k | £1.53m | £510.00k | £399.00k | £317.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £55.99m | £41.82m | £34.23m | £34.09m | £29.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.92m | £5.07m | £4.57m | £5.09m | £5.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £783.00k | £817.00k | £680.00k | £663.00k | £829.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £9.22m | £6.76m | £3.72m | £3.63m | £2.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £45.00k | £62.00k | £13.00k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £556.00k | £361.00k | £231.00k | £58.00k | £259.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £36.15m | £29.06m | £22.13m | £22.44m | £18.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.71m | -£2.29m | -£567.00k | -£361.00k | -£169.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.77m | £5.50m | £4.50m | £3.63m | £2.52m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/09/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2015 as amended on 30 Oct 2023 as amended on 20 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO AID IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; PROVIDE HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR THE PURPOSES OF ADVANCING EDUCATION OR RELIEVING POVERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; AND PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR; AND FOR THOSE PURPOSES ONLY: TO SEND VOLUNTEERS TO OTHER COUNTRIES TO SHARE AND DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING AND TO SHARE THEIR EXPERIENCE WITH OTHERS ON RETURN; TO UNDERTAKE OR ASSIST IN WORKS AND PROJECTS OF ALL KINDS; AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE NATURE, CAUSES, AND EFFECTS OF POVERTY AND THE VALUE OF VOLUNTEERING; TO CONDUCT AND PURSUE RESEARCH CONCERNING THESE MATTERS AND TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE MAKE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUSSELL COOKE SOLICITORS
2 PUTNEY HILL
LONDON
SW15 6AB
- Phone:
- 02087807500
- Email:
- company.secretary@vsoint.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window