Accounts and annual returns THE OSTEOPATHIC FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 313785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 14 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 02 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window